for squares use this formula (a square+2ab+b square), for every 2 digit no. starting from right end here is one ex. let 87 a=8, b=7 , then starts form right end so b squares is 49 , last digit is 9 from right end and 2ab =112 so from above we have 4 so,112+4=116, so next digit is 6, and next is a square =64 , so from above we have have 11 so add it 64+11=75, so ans is 7569 is the ans

Short tricks for Square of 2 digit no. which is ends in 5. For Example 35 is the number you want to square. Multiply the first digit of number with the next to its number. i.e 3*4 is equal to 12. finally add 25 at the end of result. Answer:- 1225

Right now my concentration is on UIIC-Generalist officer preparation. Is it possible to get materials about Finance in objective exam point of view. Looking forth your valuable reply at the earliest.

hi sir, please tell the shortcut of 459*984.i prepare a bank exam.please reply the shortcut to my email.how to correct the errors part in english.please reply the way

Sir this is Srinivas preparing for the IBPS. please send me the short cut for the numbers which are in the decimal form (both multiplication and division)

thnx a lot for providing wonderful tricks

ReplyDeletemore shortcuts please?tnx for the help..

ReplyDeletetnx

ReplyDeletesir i am prepairing for bank exam. please send me important sort trick to my email.

ReplyDeleteplease-please.

please tell me he how to findout the put zero after or before the given number

ReplyDeletevery useful shortcuts.

ReplyDeleteHi, you have to put zero after the given number and then subtract original number from this new number so that you will get result.

ReplyDeleteHere is the example:

587*9?

Put zero after 587 then you will get 5870 ad then subtract 587 from 5870.

The result is 5283.

These shortcuts r very useful.i want 2 know more shortcuts which will b beneficial in exams so pls kindly update shortcuts to my mail

ReplyDeletehi i want multiplicaion tricks for bank exams

ReplyDeletei want bank exams shortcurts for simplifications in quantative...............

ReplyDeleteBANK EXAM TRICS FOR QUANTATIVE.......

ReplyDeletewhat will be the multiplication of 14478*83

ReplyDeleteI want more shortcuts for maths plz send my mail

ReplyDeletefor squares use this formula (a square+2ab+b square), for every 2 digit no. starting from right end

ReplyDeletehere is one ex. let 87 a=8, b=7 , then starts form right end so b squares is 49 , last digit is 9 from right end and 2ab =112 so from above we have 4 so,112+4=116, so next digit is 6, and next is a square =64 , so from above we have have 11 so add it 64+11=75, so ans is 7569 is the ans

175 x 175 = (170 x 180) + (5 x 5)

ReplyDelete= 30,625

275 x 275 = (270 x 280) + (5 x 5)

= 75,625, and u know how to mul 2 digit no. with 2 digit no.

pls send more shortcuts to my email

ReplyDeleteVery nice one thx....waiting for the next shortcut

ReplyDeletethanx for math tricks

ReplyDeleteI Will teach u Multiplication of 5 with any no.-

ReplyDeleteLet 8798*5=?

First Multiply with 8798 by 10 = 87980, then divide it by 2 ="43990" this is the result.

So you can multiply any no with 5 by following this rule.

Short tricks for Square of 2 digit no. which is ends in 5. For Example 35 is the number you want to square. Multiply the first digit of number with the next to its number. i.e 3*4 is equal to 12. finally add 25 at the end of result. Answer:- 1225

ReplyDeletepl tell me square for every 3 digit number.

ReplyDeleteI WANT MORE TRICKS FOR QUANTITATIVE PLZ MAIL TO ME..........

ReplyDeleteHELLO SIR...

ReplyDeletePLS TELL ME THE SHORT TRICKS OF COMBINATION SELECTION qUESTION,AND c.I & s.I

tHANKS

plz tell shotcut method of mulyiplicayion

ReplyDeleteThank you these short tricks really help for sbi exam prep. plz kindly send more trick update on my mail.

ReplyDeleteplz send me important tricks for SBI PO along with some useful books

ReplyDeletehi sir, please tell me shortcut method for 3 (or) more digits multiplications

ReplyDeleteeg:- 346*648

Hi Sir,

ReplyDeleteCan you pls send me the tricks for solving data interpretation for po exam within time to my mail id preethiaug31@gmail.com

Please tell me 8427*19

ReplyDeleteHello sir,

ReplyDeleteVery goodevening!

can tou send me some more tricks,,on that

hello sir.. how to solve it by a shirtcut method....(755% of 523)/777=?

ReplyDeleteHello Friends , I am prepairing my bank exam first time ,Please send me sort trick.

ReplyDelete8427*2 = 16854

ReplyDeleteNow put a zero at the end to make it 168540

Subtract 168540

- 8427

__________

161013

sir,i m preparation 4r bank or ssc exam so plz kindly tel me how i can solve square of 3 digits number,plz give me some short tricks.

ReplyDeleteHai Mentor,

ReplyDeleteRight now my concentration is on UIIC-Generalist officer preparation.

Is it possible to get materials about Finance in objective exam point of view.

Looking forth your valuable reply at the earliest.

HCF and LCM ka short method kya hoga sir/madam please tell me

ReplyDeleteplz send me some short cuts methord

ReplyDeletePLZ SEND ME THE TRICKS

ReplyDelete33*45 how to calculate in short cut

ReplyDeletemethod

plz reply sir

ReplyDeletesry sir i got ansr as ur method

ReplyDeleteits very useful to us

thanku

sir who ever you are but you are great. really i m crazy to know more about the short method of counting and like more......pls pls send my on email

ReplyDeleteDanish Arbi

danisharbi@yahoo.com

plz send me short trick for square,multiplation,divide,data surffng,seating,direction

ReplyDeleteU r genius

ReplyDeleteplz send me some tricks and shortcuts for GENERAL ENGLISH, REASONING, AND QUANTITATIVE APPTITUDE my mail is nagendrababu.215@gmail.com

ReplyDeletePlease send me all the shortcut tricks for bank exams.

ReplyDeleteThanks and Regards.

please send me the qa shortcuts(all topics)

ReplyDeleteSqure of 87

ReplyDeleteSqure of 7=49 put 9 @ right end

Then 8*87+8*7+4=756

Now write it together 7569

Hi Mohan,

ReplyDeleteUr tips are very usefully, Pls. send some more multiplication short cuts to my mail ID

Thanks in Advance

sir i am prepairing for bank exam. please send me important sort trick to my email.

ReplyDeleteplease-please.

plz send short cuts for quantitative aptituted

ReplyDeleteplz send shortcuts for quantitative aptitude all topics

ReplyDeletehi sir,

ReplyDeleteplease tell the shortcut of 459*984.i prepare a bank exam.please reply the shortcut to my email.how to correct the errors part in english.please reply the way

good

ReplyDeleteSir this is Srinivas preparing for the IBPS. please send me the short cut for the numbers which are in the decimal form (both multiplication and division)

ReplyDelete